Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Filippo Gentile

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1809Born
22 Sep 183223.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 184232.8SelectedBishop of Novara, Italy
27 Jan 184333.3ConfirmedBishop of Novara, Italy
7 May 184333.6Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
23 Oct 187566.1DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Filippo Gentile
Bishop Giacomo Filippo Gentile (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 419
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 287
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017