Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Antonio Colli

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1811Born
19 Dec 183524.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186755.6AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
9 Jun 186755.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
1 Nov 187261.2DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Antonio Colli (VIAF: 88671062)
Bishop Giacomo Antonio Colli (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Ordained BishopS. Guadence, Novare, Diocese of Novara

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017