Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Maria Ferrè

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1815Born
23 Dec 183722.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Crema, Italy
31 Mar 183822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
5 Jan 185741.5SelectedBishop of Crema, Italy
19 Mar 185741.7ConfirmedBishop of Crema, Italy
29 Mar 185741.7Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
24 May 185741.8InstalledBishop of Crema, Italy
20 Jun 185943.9AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
27 Mar 186751.7AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
13 Apr 188670.7DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Ferrè (VIAF: 32881215)
Bishop Pietro Maria Ferrè (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerdello, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 187, and Page 230
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017