Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Garga

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1822Born
21 Dec 184422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
29 Jul 187250.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
29 Jul 187250.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
18 Aug 187250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
12 May 188967.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Garga
Bishop Pietro Garga (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesara, Diocese of Novara
Ordained BishopNovara, Diocese of Novara

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 319
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017