Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Capelli

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1823Born
7 Mar 184622.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 187450.9AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
29 Jun 187451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
25 Apr 189066.9DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Capelli
Bishop Vincenzo Capelli (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVigevano, Diocese of Vigevano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vigevano, Diocese of Vigevano

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 242
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017