Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giuseppe de Gaudenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1812Born
1 Feb 183522.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187159.3AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
1 Nov 187159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
15 Oct 189179.3DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giuseppe de Gaudenzi (VIAF: 307374855)
Bishop Pietro Giuseppe de Gaudenzi (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangosco Lomellino, Diocese of Vercelli
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 591
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017