Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modesto (Luigi Eugenio) Contratto, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1798BornBagnasco
27 Jun 183638.2SelectedBishop of Acqui, Italy
21 Nov 183638.6ConfirmedBishop of Acqui, Italy
2 Apr 183738.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
6 Dec 186769.6DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Modesto (Luigi Eugenio) Contratto
Bishop Modesto (Luigi Eugenio) Contratto O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1837, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016