Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andreas Charvaz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1793BornHautecour
24 Jun 181824.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 183339.8SelectedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
20 Jan 183440.1ConfirmedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
9 Mar 183440.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
9 May 184854.4ResignedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
3 Jul 184854.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
2 Jun 185258.4SelectedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
27 Sep 185258.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
7 Aug 186975.6ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Oct 187076.8DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andreas Charvaz:
Archbishop Andreas Charvaz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 316, and Page 506
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013