Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Domenico Varesini

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1798Born
23 Sep 182022.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 183840.0SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
13 Sep 183840.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
14 Oct 183840.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
22 Sep 186466.4DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Domenico Varesini
Archbishop Alessandro Domenico Varesini (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel-Cermelli

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast