Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emanuele Marongiu Nurra

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1794BornBessude
18 Dec 181925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sassari, Italy
23 Feb 184247.9SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
23 May 184248.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
28 Aug 184248.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
12 Sep 186672.4DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Marongiu Nurra
Archbishop Emanuele Marongiu Nurra (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016