Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Melini

Deceased

Bishop of Modigliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1798BornMontalcino
7 Apr 182122.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 May 182122.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 185355.1AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
26 Dec 185355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Modigliana, Italy
9 Mar 186566.3DiedBishop of Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Melini:
Bishop Mario Melini (born , died ) Bishop of Modigliana

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013