Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gesualdo Vitali

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1809Born
22 Sep 183222.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185242.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
27 Sep 185242.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
3 Oct 185242.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
27 Mar 186555.4AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
31 Dec 187970.1DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gesualdo Vitali (VIAF: 89523143)
Bishop Gesualdo Vitali (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondolfo
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 80, and Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017