Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Saba

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1775Born
17 Dec 180328.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 184266.5SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
22 Jul 184266.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
30 Nov 184267.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
13 Feb 186084.2DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Saba
Archbishop Giovanni Saba (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 86
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,842, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast