Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Jourdain

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1780BornSaint-André
15 Dec 180525.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jun 183252.1SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
2 Jul 183252.1ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
23 Sep 183252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
29 May 185979.0DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Jourdain:
Bishop Andrea Jourdain (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013