Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Rochaix

Deceased

Bishop of Tarentaise


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1762³BornSaint-Jean-de-Maurienne
23 Dec 178624.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 182765.5SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
28 Jan 182865.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
7 Apr 182865.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
19 Nov 183674.4DiedBishop of Tarentaise, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Rochaix:
Bishop Antoine Rochaix (born , died ) Bishop of Tarentaise

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013