Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Uda

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1775³Born
21 Sep 179924.0Ordained PriestPriest
May 1844³68.6SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
20 Jan 184569.3ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
20 Apr 184569.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
2 Dec 184570.2DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Uda
Bishop Antonio Uda (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilis, Archdiocese of Oristano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast