Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Marongiu Maccioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1793Born
8 Jun 181622.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 184855.1SelectedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
11 Dec 184855.4ConfirmedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
6 May 184955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
9 Oct 185259.2ResignedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
7 Apr 186167.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Marongiu Maccioni
Bishop Emanuele Marongiu Maccioni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIglesias
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ales, Diocese of Ales e Terralba

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast