Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio La Scala

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1817BornLucera
4 Apr 184022.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 185235.1SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
27 Sep 185235.4ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
3 Oct 185235.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
27 Sep 185841.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
25 Apr 188971.9DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio La Scala
Bishop Antonio La Scala (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 280, and Page 515
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Dec 2016