Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Pellino

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1781³BornNapoli
21 Sep 180524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
21 Mar 183250.5SelectedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
2 Jul 183250.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
8 Jul 183250.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
6 Oct 183554.0DiedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Pellino (VIAF: 89353927)
Archbishop Gennaro Pellino (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza e Campagna

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Jul 2016