Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Cirino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1805Born
22 Sep 182722.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 186964.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
22 Nov 186964.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
30 Nov 186964.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
8 Nov 188479.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
12 May 189691.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cirino (VIAF: 304920130)
Archbishop Giovanni Cirino (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNicosia, Diocese of Nicosia
Ordained BishopS. Andrea della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100, and Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1869, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017