Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Turano

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1814BornPalermo
2 Oct 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
23 Feb 187257.9AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
17 Mar 187258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Feb 188570.8DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Turano:
Bishop Domenico Turano (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 82
  • c34: CB, 7 Mar 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013