Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Maragioglio, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1811Born
27 Apr 183422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Mar 187563.8AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
4 Apr 187563.8Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
20 Jan 188876.6DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Maragioglio
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Maragioglio O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalemi
Ordained BishopPalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 434
  • b/c2+: AT, 15 Jun 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,881
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017