Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano d’Alessandro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cefalý, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Cius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1834Born
6 Jun 185722.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188449.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cefalý, Italy
24 Mar 188449.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
20 Apr 188449.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
18 Mar 188853.5SucceededBishop of Cefalý, Italy
8 May 190671.6ResignedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
8 May 190671.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cius
Jan 1911³76.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cefalý, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano d’Alessandro (VIAF: 88747643)
Archbishop Gaetano d’Alessandro (born , died Jan 1911) Bishop Emeritus of Cefalý

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1884, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017