Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Daddi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1827Born
2 Jul 185325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
24 Mar 188456.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
24 Mar 188456.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
20 Apr 188456.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
1897¹69.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Daddi (VIAF: 88707394)
Bishop Giacomo Daddi (born , died 1897) Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017