Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Zuccaro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta

Titular Bishop of Archelaïs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1839BornPalermo
14 Jun 186222.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189656.8AppointedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
19 Jul 189656.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
30 Apr 190666.7ResignedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
30 Apr 190666.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
28 Nov 191374.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Zuccaro:
Bishop Ignazio Zuccaro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,234
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013