Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Guarino

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1827Born
22 Sep 184922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
23 Feb 187244.9AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
17 Mar 187245.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
5 Jul 187548.3AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
16 Jan 189365.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189365.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
22 Sep 189770.5DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Guarino (VIAF: 88933681)
Giuseppe Cardinal Guarino (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontedoro, Diocese of Caltanissetta
Ordained PriestCaltanissetta, Diocese of Caltanissetta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Death PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Buried Place (Original)Monumental, Cemetery, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina
Buried Place (Current)Apostole della Sacra Famiglia, General House, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 380, and Page 531
  • c34: CB, 7 Mar 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1872, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017