Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Stromillo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caltanissetta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1789BornGorga
26 Mar 181424.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 183242.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
9 Nov 184455.3SelectedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
20 Jan 184555.5ConfirmedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
16 Feb 184555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
7 Jan 185868.4DiedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Stromillo (VIAF: 89566861)
Bishop Antonio Maria Stromillo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Caltanissetta

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016