Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bongiorni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltagirone

Titular Bishop of Flaviopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1830BornPalazzolo Acreide
Dec 1852³22.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
Dec 1853³23.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187444.4AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
14 Mar 187544.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trapani, Italy
17 Apr 187544.7InstalledBishop of Trapani, Italy
22 Sep 187949.1AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
Mar 1887³56.6ResignedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
14 Mar 188756.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
4 Dec 190171.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltagirone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bongiorni:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bongiorni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltagirone

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 171, and Page 251
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013