Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Blandini

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1834BornPalagoniae
6 Jun 185722.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 188046.0AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
13 May 188146.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
29 May 188146.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
15 Mar 188348.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Feb 188550.4SucceededBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
19 May 189863.7DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Blandini:
Bishop Gaetano Blandini (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 82, and Page 514
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013