Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerlando Maria Genuardi

Deceased

Bishop of Acireale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1839Born
20 Sep 186223.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 187232.8AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
11 Aug 187232.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acireale, Italy
10 Nov 187233.1InstalledBishop of Acireale, Italy
4 Jun 190767.7DiedBishop of Acireale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerlando Maria Genuardi (VIAF: 89028025)
Bishop Gerlando Maria Genuardi (born , died ) Bishop of Acireale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGirgenti, Diocese of Agrigento (Girgenti)
Ordained BishopSs. Vincent et Anastase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017