Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Palermo

Deceased

Bishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1825Born
22 Dec 184924.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 188155.4AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
5 Jun 188155.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
14 Mar 188761.2AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
9 Feb 190377.1DiedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Palermo
Bishop Mariano Palermo (born , died ) Bishop of Piazza Armerina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaletto, Diocese of Catania
Ordained BishopCaltanissetta, Diocese of Caltanissetta

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 346, and Page 459
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017