Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Guttadauro di Reburdone

Deceased

Bishop of Caltanissetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1814Born
22 Sep 183824.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185844.2AppointedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
9 Jan 185944.3Ordained BishopBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
26 Apr 189681.6DiedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Guttadauro di Reburdone (VIAF: 90372018)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Guttadauro di Reburdone (born , died ) Bishop of Caltanissetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017