Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Caff

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1833Born
19 Dec 185724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
3 Jul 188248.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy
3 Jul 188248.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
15 Aug 188249.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
12 Oct 189562.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Caff
Bishop Antonio Caff (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,545
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1882, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017