Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Blandini

Deceased

Bishop of Noto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1832Born
24 Mar 185523.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 187543.3AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
15 Aug 187543.4Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
4 Jan 191380.8DiedBishop of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Blandini (VIAF: 23066353)
Bishop Giovanni Blandini (born , died ) Bishop of Noto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalagonia, Diocese of Caltagirone
Ordained BishopCathedral, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 411
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,875, Number 46
  • c34: CB, 15 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,739

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast