Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Fiandaca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Patti, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1857Born
19 Oct 187922.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 190346.1AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
29 Jun 190346.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
10 Apr 191254.9AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
1 Aug 193073.2ResignedBishop of Patti, Italy
1 Aug 193073.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
18 Feb 194183.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Fiandaca
Archbishop Ferdinando Fiandaca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Caterina Villarmosa

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,931
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 414
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,903, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast