Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Bella

Deceased

Bishop of Acireale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1862BornAci Catena
10 Apr 188624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
29 Apr 190947.1AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
13 Jun 190947.2Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
17 Dec 192058.7AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
24 Apr 192159.1InstalledBishop of Acireale, Italy
29 Mar 192260.0DiedBishop of Acireale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Bella:
Bishop Salvatore Bella (born , died ) Bishop of Acireale

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015