Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Arista-Vigo, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acireale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1863BornPalermo
25 Jun 188825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Nov 190441.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Acireale, Italy
14 Nov 190441.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
30 Nov 190441.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
4 Nov 190744.6AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
16 Nov 190744.6InstalledBishop of Acireale, Italy
27 Sep 192057.5DiedBishop of Acireale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Arista-Vigo:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Arista-Vigo C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Acireale

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013