Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Cesareo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1826Born
19 Apr 185125.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 189670.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
15 Nov 189670.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
20 Feb 190781.0DiedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Cesareo
Bishop Antonio Maria Cesareo (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania, Italy
Death PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania, Italy

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 301
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,896, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast