Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmelo Patané

Deceased

Archbishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1869Born
16 Apr 189222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
11 Jan 191848.2AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
17 Feb 191848.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
7 Jul 193060.7AppointedArchbishop of Catania, Italy
3 Apr 195282.5DiedArchbishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Patané
Archbishop Carmelo Patané (born , died ) Archbishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiarre

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 10
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 652, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast