Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Petronelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1880BornLecce
19 Jul 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jan 192948.5AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
26 May 192948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino, Italy
28 Jul 192949.0InstalledBishop of Avellino, Italy
25 May 193958.8AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
16 Jun 194766.9DiedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Petronelli:
Archbishop Francesco Petronelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013