Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Di Donna, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1901Born
18 May 192422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
2 Feb 194038.4AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
31 Mar 194038.6Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
1 Jan 195250.3DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Di Donna (VIAF: 317274457)
Bishop Giuseppe Di Donna O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRutigliano

  • a priest for 27.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast