Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oronzo Luciano Durante

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1864BornMelendugno
4 Jun 188722.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 192257.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
27 Aug 192257.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
22 Oct 192257.8InstalledBishop of San Severo, Italy
5 Nov 194176.8DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Oronzo Luciano Durante:
Bishop Oronzo Luciano Durante (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015