Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Trama

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1856Born
18 Dec 188024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 190145.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
22 Dec 190145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
14 Feb 190245.4AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
9 Nov 192771.1DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Trama (VIAF: 89531974)
Bishop Gennaro Trama (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Damaso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 179, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 74
  • c4 title: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • opd/c1/loc: CB, 5 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast