Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Paino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Messina

Titular Archbishop of Serrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1870BornSanta Marina Salina
16 Sep 189424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lipari, Italy
12 Jul 190939.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
25 Jul 190939.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
10 Jan 192150.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Messina, Italy
10 Jan 192150.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of AntinoŽ
10 Feb 192352.6AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
3 Mar 192352.7InstalledArchbishop of Messina, Italy
7 Mar 196392.7RetiredArchbishop of Messina, Italy
7 Mar 196392.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serrae
29 Jul 196797.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Paino:
Archbishop Angelo Paino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Messina

  • a priest for 72.9 years
  • a bishop for 58.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1909, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013