Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Giardina

Deceased

Bishop of Nicosia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1884Born
30 Sep 190622.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 193551.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
10 Aug 193551.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
28 Oct 193551.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
8 Aug 194258.3AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
18 Feb 195368.8DiedBishop of Nicosia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Giardina
Bishop Pio Giardina (born , died ) Bishop of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Domenica Vittoria

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018