Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Mores

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nusco

Titular Archbishop of Phulli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1873BornLucera
25 Jul 189623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lucera, Italy
15 Dec 191946.9AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
18 Jan 192047.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
31 Jan 195077.1RetiredBishop of Nusco, Italy
31 Jan 195077.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phulli
15 May 196087.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Mores:
Archbishop Pasquale Mores (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nusco

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,231
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013