Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Melchiade Ferlisi

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1788Born
23 May 181728.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 185869.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
4 Jul 185869.5Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
23 Mar 186071.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
10 Jan 186576.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Melchiade Ferlisi
Patriarch Melchiade Ferlisi (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasteltermini
Ordained BishopChapel of the Choir, St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1858, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017