Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto D’Acquisto, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1790Born
5 Feb 181424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
23 Dec 185868.8AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
2 Jan 185968.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
7 Aug 186777.5DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto D’Acquisto (VIAF: 37838592)
Archbishop Benedetto D’Acquisto O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonreale, Archdiocese of Monreale
Ordained BishopS. Pietro in Nontorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017