Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Mennella

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ischia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Mennith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1834Born
19 Sep 185723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ischia, Italy
18 Nov 188147.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ischia, Italy
18 Nov 188147.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
22 Jan 188247.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mennith
30 Jul 188349.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Mennella
Bishop Carlo Mennella (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasamicciola, Diocese of Ischia
Ordained BishopFilles du Sacré Coeur, Via Graziosa, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCasamicciola, Diocese of Ischia

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 380
  • c34: CB, 3 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 2
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,789
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast