Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Lavecchia Guarnieri, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1813Born
20 May 183723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 Feb 187258.6AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
17 Mar 187258.7Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
5 Jul 187562.0AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 Mar 189682.6DiedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Lavecchia Guarnieri
Archbishop Benedetto Lavecchia Guarnieri O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanicatti, Diocese of Agrigento (Girgenti)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 410, and Page 531
  • c34: CB, 7 Mar 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1872, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017